DC B23-0025 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Law L23-0001, Effective from Apr 18, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 5539
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Law L23-0001, Effective from Apr 18, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 5539
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
LEGISLATIVE SUMMARY - Law 23-1 exempts the initial procurement contract entered into in connection with the Sports Wagering Lottery Amendment Act of 2018 and the corresponding emergency legislation from the requirements of the Procurement Practices Reform Act of 2010.
Title
Sports Wagering Procurement Practices Reform Exemption Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Council - First Reading (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Council - First Reading (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Council | Law L23-0001, Effective from Apr 18, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 5539 |
2019-03-07 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2019-03-01 | Council | Act A23-0007 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 2451 |
2019-02-25 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2019-02-22 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0007 |
2019-02-19 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 6, 2019 |
2019-02-19 | Council | Final Reading |
2019-02-05 | Council | First Reading |
2019-01-30 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2019-01-30 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0025 |
2019-01-28 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-01-11 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-01-11 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0025 Published in the DC Register |
2019-01-08 | Council | Referred to Committee on Finance and Revenue |
2019-01-08 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |