DC B23-0039 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-11 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-11 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced it establishes a panel of special education attorneys to represent students with identified special education needs who are in the criminal justice system. The Criminal Division of the Superior Court will establish the panel of special education attorneys.
Title
Special Education Rights for Youth Defendants Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] |
Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] | Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] |
Cnc. Robert White [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-11 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-06-07 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-01-18 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0039 Published in the DC Register |
2019-01-08 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2019-01-08 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0039 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/41630/Introduction/B23-0039-Introduction.pdf |