DC B23-0042 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-07 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-07 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced it requires Construction Code violators who damage adjoining property be ordered to repair the damage or pay restitution to the owner.
Title
Substandard Construction Relief Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-07 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-10-18 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-01-18 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0042 Published in the DC Register |
2019-01-08 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2019-01-08 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0042 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/41633/Introduction/B23-0042-Introduction.pdf |