DC B23-0073 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced it authorizes the Attorney General to bring civil actions under the Human Rights Act. It clarifies that the aggrieved party in a fair housing action, may retain his or her own counsel and it also clarifies when the Attorney General may seek to withdraw from representing the aggrieved party while continuing to represent the District of Columbia's interests.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Attorney General Civil Rights Enforcement Clarification Amendment Act Of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-08CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2019-06-14CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-05-31CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-01-25CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0073 Published in the DC Register
2019-01-22CouncilReferred to Committee on Government Operations
2019-01-16CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback