DC B23-0090 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Enrolled on December 29 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-22 - Act A23-0606 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001220
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 29 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-22 - Act A23-0606 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001220
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced it establishes a Commission on Poverty to address the needs and interests of persons in poverty. The Commission must evaluate existing and subsequent anti-poverty programs to determine their effectiveness and make recommendations for improvement. The Commission shall meet a minimum of 9 times annually with no less than 4 meetings held in areas of the District with high concentrations of poverty.
FUNDING NOTE - This bill is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement in "Other Documents".
Title
Commission on Poverty in the District of Columbia Establishment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-15 - Council - Amendment (T. White) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-15 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-12-01 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-12-15 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-12-01 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-22 | Council | Act A23-0606 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001220 |
2021-01-14 | Council | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A23-0606 |
2021-01-14 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-12-29 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 13, 2021 |
2020-12-15 | Council | Amendment (T. White) |
2020-12-15 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-12-01 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-11-20 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-11-19 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0090 |
2019-01-25 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0090 Published in the DC Register |
2019-01-22 | Council | Referred to Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
2019-01-22 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |