DC B23-0091 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Vetoed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Vetoed by the Mayor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Vetoed by the Mayor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced it establishes, as a subordinate agency within the executive branch of the District government, the Department of Buildings. The Department is charged with promoting the health, safety, and quality of life of residents and visitors in the District of Columbia by reviewing proposed plans for technical sufficiency, issuing permits, inspecting the built environment, regulating land use and development, and enforcing the regulations and codes governing building construction, rental housing conditions, building maintenance, and building safety.
FUNDING NOTE - This bill is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement in "Other Documents".
Title
Department of Buildings Establishment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-15 - Council - Amendments 1-3 (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-15 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-12-01 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-12-15 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-12-01 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Council | Vetoed by the Mayor |
2021-01-13 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-12-29 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 13, 2021 |
2020-12-15 | Council | Amendments 1-3 (Mendelson) |
2020-12-15 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-12-14 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-12-01 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-12-01 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0091 |
2019-12-10 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-11-08 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-01-25 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0091 Published in the DC Register |
2019-01-22 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2019-01-22 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |