DC B23-0097 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - Law L23-0031, Effective from Nov 26, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 16309
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - Law L23-0031, Effective from Nov 26, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 16309
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
LEGISLATIVE SUMMARY - Law 23-97 extends the opt out from denying TANF benefits to certain drug felons to other locally-funded public benefit programs.
Title
Access to Public Benefits Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-17 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Council | Law L23-0031, Effective from Nov 26, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 16309 |
2019-10-11 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2019-10-11 | Council | Act A23-0120 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 13144 |
2019-10-07 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2019-10-07 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0120 |
2019-09-23 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 7, 2019 |
2019-09-17 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-07-09 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2019-07-03 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2019-07-01 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0097 |
2019-04-24 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-04-05 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-02-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Human Services |
2019-02-01 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0097 Published in the DC Register |
2019-01-24 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |