DC B23-0099 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Act A23-0022 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 3991, Expires on Jun 25, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Act A23-0022 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 3991, Expires on Jun 25, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Small and Certified Business Enterprise Development and Assistance Emergency Amendment Act of 2019
Title
Small and Certified Business Enterprise Development and Assistance Emergency Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (McDuffie) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (McDuffie) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Council - Postponed to March 5th Legislative Meeting (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (McDuffie) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (McDuffie) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Council - Postponed to March 5th Legislative Meeting (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-05 | Council | Act A23-0022 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 3991, Expires on Jun 25, 2019 |
2019-03-28 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2019-03-27 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0022, Expires on Jun 25, 2019 |
2019-03-18 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on April 1, 2019 |
2019-03-05 | Council | Final Reading |
2019-03-05 | Council | Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (McDuffie) |
2019-02-05 | Council | Postponed to March 5th Legislative Meeting |
2019-02-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-01-31 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |