DC B23-0100 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Law L23-0007, Effective from Jun 04, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 7060, Expires on Jan 15, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Law L23-0007, Effective from Jun 04, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 7060, Expires on Jan 15, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Small and Certified Business Enterprise Development and Assistance Temporary Amendment Act of 2019
Title
Small and Certified Business Enterprise Development and Assistance Temporary Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (McDuffie) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (McDuffie) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Council - Postponed to March 5th Legislative Meeting (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (McDuffie) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (McDuffie) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Council - Postponed to March 5th Legislative Meeting (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Council | Law L23-0007, Effective from Jun 04, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 7060, Expires on Jan 15, 2020 |
2019-04-26 | Council | Act A23-0039 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 5250 |
2019-04-22 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2019-04-17 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2019-04-15 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0039 |
2019-04-04 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on April 19, 2019 |
2019-04-02 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-03-08 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0100 Published in the DC Register |
2019-03-05 | Council | First Reading |
2019-03-05 | Council | Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (McDuffie) |
2019-02-05 | Council | Postponed to March 5th Legislative Meeting |
2019-02-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-01-31 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |