DC B23-0122 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Act A23-0567 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001031
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Act A23-0567 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001031
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced it prohibits retail establishments from discriminating against cash as a form of payment, including charging different prices to customers depending on their payment method.
FUNDING NOTE - This bill is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement in "Other Documents".
Title
Cashless Retailers Prohibition Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
Cnc. Trayon White [D] | Cnc. Phil Mendelson [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-12-15 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-12-15 - Council - Amendment (B. Todd) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-01 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-12-15 - Council - Amendment (B. Todd) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-01 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-22 | Council | Act A23-0567 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001031 |
2021-01-14 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-01-13 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0567 |
2020-12-29 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 13, 2021 |
2020-12-15 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-12-15 | Council | Amendment (B. Todd) |
2020-12-14 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-12-01 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-12-01 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0122 |
2020-02-13 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-12-27 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-02-15 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0122 Published in the DC Register |
2019-02-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2019-02-05 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |