DC B23-0135 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-27 - Law L23-0020, Effective from Sep 11, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 12635
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-27 - Law L23-0020, Effective from Sep 11, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 12635
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law 23-20 clarifies and updates certain provisions of the Electric Company Infrastructure Improvement Financing Act of 2014 to expand contracting opportunities for certified business enterprises in the District of Columbia by allowing preferences to certified business enterprises. It also clarifies the requirements related to procurement for certain architectural and engineering services.
Title
Power Line Undergrounding Program Certified Business Enterprise Utilization Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-09 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Council - First Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Council - First Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-27 | Council | Law L23-0020, Effective from Sep 11, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 12635 |
2019-08-02 | Council | Act A23-0096 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 9724 |
2019-07-30 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2019-07-26 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2019-07-24 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0096 |
2019-07-15 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 29, 2019 |
2019-07-09 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-06-25 | Council | First Reading |
2019-06-19 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2019-06-19 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0135 |
2019-05-13 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-04-12 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-02-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2019-02-15 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0135 Published in the DC Register |
2019-02-06 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |