DC B23-0173 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-15 - Law L23-0075, Effective from Apr 16, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 4997
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-15 - Law L23-0075, Effective from Apr 16, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 4997
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
LEGISLATIVE SUMMARY - Law 23-75 allows payment of a real estate commission to be made to a business entity.
Title
Accounting Clarification for Real Estate Professionals Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] |
Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Cnc. Trayon White [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | Council | Law L23-0075, Effective from Apr 16, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 4997 |
2020-03-06 | Council | Act A23-0222 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 2486 |
2020-03-05 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2020-02-28 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-02-27 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0222 |
2020-02-14 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 2, 2020 |
2020-02-04 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-01-07 | Council | First Reading |
2019-12-31 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2019-12-20 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0173 |
2019-10-02 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-08-23 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-03-15 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0173 Published in the DC Register |
2019-03-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Housing and Neighborhood Revitalization |
2019-03-05 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |