DC B23-0181 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Act A23-0571 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001086
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Act A23-0571 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001086
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced it establishes when a petitioner including an intimate partner, family member, household member, victim of sexual abuse, a minor or a minor's parent, guardian or custodian, may file a petition for civil protection in the Domestic Violence Unit. It creates anti-stalking orders. Among other things, it allows the court to extend temporary protection orders incrementally and establishes a dedicated unit in the MPD to serve process in civil protection order cases.
Title
Intrafamily Offenses and Anti-Stalking Orders Amendment Act of 2019 (now known as "Intrafamily Offenses and Anti-Stalking Orders Amendment Act of 2020")
Sponsors
Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] |
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Phil Mendelson [D] |
Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-12-15 - Council - Amendment (C. Allen) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-15 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-12-01 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-12-15 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-12-01 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-22 | Council | Act A23-0571 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001086 |
2021-01-14 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-01-13 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0571 |
2020-12-29 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 13, 2021 |
2020-12-15 | Council | Amendment (C. Allen) |
2020-12-15 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-12-01 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-11-24 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-11-23 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0181 |
2019-03-15 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0181 Published in the DC Register |
2019-03-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2019-03-05 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |