DC B23-0201 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 9 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - Law L23-0087, Effective from May 06, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5008
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 9 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - Law L23-0087, Effective from May 06, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5008
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
LEGISLATIVE SUMMARY - Law 23-87 establishes an Office on Caribbean Affairs to monitor the delivery of services and make policy recommendations that affect the District's Caribbean community.
FUNDING NOTE - This bill is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement in "Other Documents" tab.
Title
Office of the Caribbean Affairs Establishment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] | Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] |
Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
Cnc. David Grosso [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | Council | Law L23-0087, Effective from May 06, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5008 |
2020-03-27 | Council | Act A23-0263 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 3534 |
2020-03-25 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2020-03-24 | Council | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A23-0263 |
2020-03-18 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-03-09 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 23, 2020 |
2020-03-03 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-02-04 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2019-12-19 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2019-12-19 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0201 |
2019-06-19 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-05-31 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-03-29 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0201 Published in the DC Register |
2019-03-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2019-03-19 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |