DC B23-0208 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-22 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is September 21, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Amendments moved at the Committee of the Whole may be accessed under the "Other Documents" tab. See "Other Documents" tab for the Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fiscal Year 2020 Local Budget Act Of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-28 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Council - Amendment (Allen/Nadeau) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Council - Amendment (T. White #1) (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Council - Amendments (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Council - Amendment (Grosso, McDuffie, Todd, R. White, T. White) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-28 - Council - Amendment (T. White #2) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Council - Amendment (Bonds) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-22CouncilTransmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is September 21, 2019
2019-07-19CouncilAct A23-0078 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 8242
2019-07-15CouncilSigned with Act Number A23-0078
2019-07-15CouncilEnacted with Act Number A23-0078
2019-06-28CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 15, 2019
2019-06-07CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-05-28CouncilAmendment (T. White #1)
2019-05-28CouncilAmendment (Bonds)
2019-05-28CouncilAmendment (Allen/Nadeau)
2019-05-28CouncilAmendment (Gray - Ruled Out of Order and Not Considered)
2019-05-28CouncilAmendment (Grosso, McDuffie, Todd, R. White, T. White)
2019-05-28CouncilAmendment (T. White #2)
2019-05-28CouncilFinal Reading
2019-05-28CouncilAmendments (Mendelson)
2019-05-28CouncilAmendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson)
2019-05-14CouncilFirst Reading
2019-04-26CouncilOversight Hearing Held
2019-04-02CouncilReferred to Committee on Committee of the Whole
2019-03-29CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0208 Published in the DC Register
2019-03-20CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback