DC B23-0212 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-17 - Law L23-0036, Effective from Dec 24, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 284
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-17 - Law L23-0036, Effective from Dec 24, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 284
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
LEGISLATIVE SUMMARY - Law 23-36 changes the date of the District of Columbia primary election in presidential election years to the 1st Tuesday in June.
Title
Primary Date Alteration Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] |
Cnc. Phil Mendelson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-10-08 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-17 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-17 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-17 | Council | Law L23-0036, Effective from Dec 24, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 284 |
2019-11-08 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2019-11-01 | Council | Act A23-0134 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 14304 |
2019-10-24 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2019-10-23 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0134 |
2019-10-11 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 28, 2019 |
2019-10-08 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-09-17 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2019-07-15 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2019-07-11 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0212 |
2019-04-29 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-04-12 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-04-02 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2019-03-29 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0212 Published in the DC Register |
2019-03-19 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |