DC B23-0222 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Act A23-0044 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 5295, Expires on Jul 14, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Act A23-0044 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 5295, Expires on Jul 14, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Contract No. CW58776 with VCare, LLC Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2019
Title
Contract No. CW58776 with VCare, LLC Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-26 | Council | Act A23-0044 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 5295, Expires on Jul 14, 2019 |
2019-04-17 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2019-04-15 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0044, Expires on Jul 14, 2019 |
2019-04-08 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on April 23, 2019 |
2019-04-02 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-04-02 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-03-26 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |