DC B23-0224 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Act A23-0046 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 5299, Expires on Jul 14, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Act A23-0046 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 5299, Expires on Jul 14, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifications to Contract No. CW25961 with Science Applications International Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2019
Title
Modifications to Contract No. CW25961 with Science Applications International Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-26 | Council | Act A23-0046 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 5299, Expires on Jul 14, 2019 |
2019-04-17 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2019-04-15 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0046, Expires on Jul 14, 2019 |
2019-04-08 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on April 23, 2019 |
2019-04-02 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-04-02 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-03-26 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |