DC B23-0225 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-20 - Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development
Pending: Council Business and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-20 - Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development
Pending: Council Business and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced it provides rules for determining when property is presumed abandoned as well as establishes requirements for notification of owners, taking custody, sale and administration of such property.
Title
Uniform Unclaimed Property Act Revision Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Jack Evans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-20 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2019-09-17 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2019-04-05 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0225 Published in the DC Register |
2019-04-02 | Council | Referred to Committee on Finance and Revenue |
2019-03-27 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0225 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/42191/Introduction/B23-0225-Introduction.pdf |