DC B23-0228 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-15 - Law L23-0088, Effective from May 06, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-15 - Law L23-0088, Effective from May 06, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
LEGISLATIVE SUMMARY - Law 23-088 permits the Mayor to authorize the use of certain public space by a legitimate theaters for operation as a sidewalk café upon obtaining the necessary licenses and endorsements by the Alcoholic Beverage Control Board.
Title
Legitimate Theater Sidewalk Cafe Authorization Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Jack Evans [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | Council | Law L23-0088, Effective from May 06, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5009 |
2020-03-27 | Council | Act A23-0256 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 3516 |
2020-03-25 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2020-03-18 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-03-17 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0256 |
2020-03-09 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 23, 2020 |
2020-03-03 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-02-04 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-01-28 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-01-28 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0228 |
2019-12-04 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-12-03 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2019-11-29 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2019-10-25 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-04-05 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0228 Published in the DC Register |
2019-04-02 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2019-04-01 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |