DC B23-0234 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on January 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-15 - Act A23-0558 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 000757
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on January 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-15 - Act A23-0558 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 000757
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced it establishes an advisory commission to study monuments, markers, and symbols throughout the District to assess their cultural and historical appropriateness.
Title
Advisory Commission on Monuments, Markers, and Symbols Establishment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-11-17 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-11-17 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-15 | Council | Act A23-0558 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 000757 |
2021-01-12 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-01-11 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0558 |
2020-12-29 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 13, 2021 |
2020-12-01 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-11-25 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-11-17 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-11-17 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0234 |
2020-01-16 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-12-27 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-04-05 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0234 Published in the DC Register |
2019-04-02 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-02 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |