DC B23-0248 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced it modernizes the framework for autonomous vehicles operating within the District. It establishes guidelines for the Department of Motor Vehicles to follow in order to register these vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Autonomous Vehicle Amendment Act Of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-02CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2019-06-28CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-06-14CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-04-05CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0248 Published in the DC Register
2019-04-02CouncilReferred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
2019-04-02CouncilIntroduced in Legislative Meeting

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback