DC B23-0249 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Act A23-0061 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 7596, Expires on Sep 17, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Act A23-0061 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 7596, Expires on Sep 17, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Contract No. CFOPD-15-C-064A Extension Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2019
Title
Contract No. CFOPD-15-C-064A Extension Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | Council | Act A23-0061 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 7596, Expires on Sep 17, 2019 |
2019-06-20 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2019-06-19 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0061, Expires on Sep 17, 2019 |
2019-06-07 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on June 21, 2019 |
2019-06-04 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-04-23 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-04-02 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |