DC B23-0250 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-24 - Law L23-0115, Effective from Jun 24, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 8976
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-24 - Law L23-0115, Effective from Jun 24, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 8976
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law 23-115 defines the practice of professional art therapy which includes assisting people to improve cognitive and sensory-motor functions, increase self-esteem, cope with grief and traumatic experience, resolve conflicts and distress, and enhance social functioning through art media. It establishes licensure requirements for art therapists and provides for the addition of a professional art therapist to the Board of Professional Counseling.
FUNDING NOTE - This bill is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement in "Other Documents" tab.
Title
Professional Art Therapist Licensure Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-07 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-24 | Council | Law L23-0115, Effective from Jun 24, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 8976 |
2020-05-15 | Council | Act A23-0307 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5077 |
2020-05-12 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2020-05-05 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-04-27 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0307 |
2020-04-17 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 1, 2020 |
2020-04-07 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-03-03 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-02-12 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-01-29 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0250 |
2019-12-19 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-11-22 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-10-25 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-04-23 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2019-04-12 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0250 Published in the DC Register |
2019-04-02 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |