DC B23-0255 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-06 - Law L23-0052, Effective from Feb 21, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 2471
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-06 - Law L23-0052, Effective from Feb 21, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 2471
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
LEGISLATIVE SUMMARY - Law 23-52 makes technical and procedural updates to Title 25 of the D.C. Official Code. Updates include removing archaic terminology and updating the zoning districts.
Title
Alcoholic Beverage Procedural and Technical Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-03 - Council - Amendment (McDuffie) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-03 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-05 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-03 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-05 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-06 | Council | Law L23-0052, Effective from Feb 21, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 2471 |
2020-01-08 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2020-01-03 | Council | Act A23-0186 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 21 |
2019-12-27 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2019-12-23 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0186 |
2019-12-12 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 27, 2019 |
2019-12-03 | Council | Final Reading |
2019-12-03 | Council | Amendment (McDuffie) |
2019-11-05 | Council | First Reading |
2019-10-23 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2019-10-16 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0255 |
2019-06-26 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-05-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-04-26 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0255 Published in the DC Register |
2019-04-23 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2019-04-11 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |