DC B23-0261 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on January 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Law L23-0062, Effective from Mar 10, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 3077
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on January 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Law L23-0062, Effective from Mar 10, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 3077
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
LEGISLATIVE SUMMARY - Law 23-62 requires the Department of Health to establish an electronic Medical Order for Scope of Treatment registry.
FUNDING NOTE - This bill is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement in "Other Documents" tab.
Title
Electronic Medical Order for Scope of Treatment Registry Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-17 - Council - Amendment (Gray) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-17 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-03 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-17 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-03 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-20 | Council | Law L23-0062, Effective from Mar 10, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 3077 |
2020-01-27 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2020-01-24 | Council | Act A23-0194 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 574 |
2020-01-17 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-01-16 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0194 |
2020-01-06 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 21, 2020 |
2019-12-17 | Council | Amendment (Gray) |
2019-12-17 | Council | Final Reading |
2019-12-03 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2019-11-14 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2019-11-07 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0261 |
2019-06-26 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-05-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-05-17 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-04-26 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0261 Published in the DC Register |
2019-04-23 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2019-04-23 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |