DC B23-0267 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 16 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-07 - Act A23-0057 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 6788, Expires on Aug 30, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 16 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-07 - Act A23-0057 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 6788, Expires on Aug 30, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Florida Avenue Multimodal Project Completion Emergency Amendment Act of 2019
Title
Florida Avenue Multimodal Project Completion Emergency Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Allen) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Allen) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-07 | Council | Act A23-0057 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 6788, Expires on Aug 30, 2019 |
2019-06-01 | Council | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A23-0057, Expires on Aug 30, 2019 |
2019-05-31 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2019-05-16 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-07 | Council | Final Reading |
2019-05-07 | Council | Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Allen) |
2019-04-23 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-04-23 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |