DC B23-0277 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-06 - Law L23-0054, Effective from Feb 21, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 2473
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-06 - Law L23-0054, Effective from Feb 21, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 2473
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
LEGISLATIVE SUMMARY - Law 23-54 increases the alcohol by volume percentage for wine from 15 to 21 percent and allows holders of wine pub and distillery pub permits to ship products directly to District residents. It allows District residents to manufacture beer and wine in their home without a license if it is for personal use and allows pub permit holders to manufacture alcoholic beverages off-site if the production facility is within 600 feet of the licensed premises. Among other things, it amends pub permits to pub endorsements, and establishes wine pub endorsement, brew pub endorsement and distillery pub endorsement fees.
Title
Manufacturer and Pub Permit Parity Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-03 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-05 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-05 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-06 | Council | Law L23-0054, Effective from Feb 21, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 2473 |
2020-01-08 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2020-01-03 | Council | Act A23-0188 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 28 |
2019-12-27 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2019-12-23 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0188 |
2019-12-12 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 27, 2019 |
2019-12-03 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-11-05 | Council | First Reading |
2019-10-23 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2019-10-16 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0277 |
2019-06-26 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-05-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-05-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0277 Published in the DC Register |
2019-05-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2019-05-03 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |