DC B23-0278 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Act A23-0067, Expires on September 18, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 7608
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To approve CA 23-116.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Contract No. Dccb-2019-c-0008 With May Firm/ekm Association On Pcbs Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Act Of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28CouncilAct A23-0067, Expires on September 18, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 7608
2019-06-20CouncilSigned with Act Number A23-0067
2019-06-20CouncilEnacted with Act Number A23-0067
2019-06-07CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on June 21, 2019
2019-06-04CouncilFinal Reading CC
2019-05-07CouncilRetained by the Council
2019-05-02CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback