DC B23-0304 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Law L23-0063, Effective from Mar 10, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 3078
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Law L23-0063, Effective from Mar 10, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 3078
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
LEGISLATIVE SUMMARY - Law 23-63 closes the alley between Lots 0047 and 0847 in Square 1445, bounded by the properties at 5529 and 5531 Sherier Place, N.W., in Ward 3.
Title
Closing of a Public Alley in Square 1445, S.O. 11-01980, Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-12-17 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-03 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-03 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-20 | Council | Law L23-0063, Effective from Mar 10, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 3078 |
2020-01-27 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2020-01-24 | Council | Act A23-0195 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 577 |
2020-01-17 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-01-16 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0195 |
2020-01-07 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 22, 2020 |
2019-12-17 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-12-13 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2019-12-03 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2019-11-19 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0304 |
2019-10-10 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-09-20 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-05-31 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0304 Published in the DC Register |
2019-05-28 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2019-05-20 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |