DC B23-0306 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-20 - Law L23-0015, Effective from Aug 31, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 12344, Expires on Apr 12, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-20 - Law L23-0015, Effective from Aug 31, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 12344, Expires on Apr 12, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Legitimate Theater Sidewalk Cafe Authorization Temporary Amendment Act of 2019
Title
Legitimate Theater Sidewalk Cafe Authorization Temporary Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Jack Evans [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-25 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-20 | Council | Law L23-0015, Effective from Aug 31, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 12344, Expires on Apr 12, 2020 |
2019-07-26 | Council | Act A23-0086 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 8487 |
2019-07-22 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2019-07-17 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2019-07-16 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0086 |
2019-07-01 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 16, 2019 |
2019-06-25 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-06-04 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-05-28 | Council | First Reading |
2019-05-28 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |