DC B23-0317 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on February 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Law L23-0071, Effective from Apr 11, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 4851
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on February 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Law L23-0071, Effective from Apr 11, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 4851
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
LEGISLATIVE SUMMARY - Law 23-71 designates Go-Go music as the official music of the District of Columbia and requires the Mayor to implement a program to support, preserve, and archive Go-Go music and its history.
Title
Go-Go Official Music of the District of Columbia Designation Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Council | Law L23-0071, Effective from Apr 11, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 4851 |
2020-03-02 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2020-02-28 | Council | Act A23-0218 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 2096 |
2020-02-20 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-02-19 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0218 |
2020-02-14 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 2, 2020 |
2020-02-04 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-01-07 | Council | First Reading |
2020-01-02 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2019-12-17 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0317 |
2019-10-30 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-10-11 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-06-14 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0317 Published in the DC Register |
2019-06-04 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2019-06-04 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |