DC B23-0320 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Oversight Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Oversight Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced it requires the Office of Police Complaints to review data and make recommendations to the District of Columbia Housing Authority and the Department of Consumer and Regulatory Affairs, and special police officers related to police misconduct, complaints, discipline, use of force and in custody deaths. It protects the confidentiality of information submitted to the Office of Police Complaints and requires an annual report analyzing such information. Among other things it establishes responsibilities for mediation and investigators. It establishes notice requirements and timelines for the transfer of complaints.
Title
Special Police Officer Oversight Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Council | Oversight Hearing Held |
2020-03-06 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-06-14 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0320 Published in the DC Register |
2019-06-04 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2019-06-04 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0320 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/42714/Introduction/B23-0320-Introduction.pdf |