DC B23-0324 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on November 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - Act A23-0484 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13867
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on November 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - Act A23-0484 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13867
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced it expands voting rights to residents incarcerated for felony convictions.
FUNDING NOTE - This bill is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement in "Other Documents".
Title
Restore the Vote Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-20 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-10-06 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-10-06 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-27 | Council | Act A23-0484 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13867 |
2020-11-17 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-11-16 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0484 |
2020-11-02 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 17, 2020 |
2020-10-20 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-10-06 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-10-01 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-09-24 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0324 |
2019-10-29 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-10-10 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-10-04 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-09-20 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-06-14 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0324 Published in the DC Register |
2019-06-04 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2019-06-04 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |