DC B23-0326 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Enrolled on July 30 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-13 - Law L23-0132, Effective from Oct 20, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13197
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on July 30 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-13 - Law L23-0132, Effective from Oct 20, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13197
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced it extends postpartum inpatient and outpatient benefits to at least a year after childbirth.
FUNDING NOTE - This bill is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement in "Other Documents".
Title
Postpartum Coverage Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-07 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-07 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-13 | Council | Law L23-0132, Effective from Oct 20, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13197 |
2020-09-03 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2020-08-21 | Council | Act A23-0390 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9887 |
2020-08-14 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-08-14 | Council | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A23-0390 |
2020-07-30 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on August 13, 2020 |
2020-07-21 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-07-07 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-07-01 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-07-01 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0326 |
2019-11-13 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-11-08 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-10-18 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-06-14 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0326 Published in the DC Register |
2019-06-04 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2019-06-04 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |