DC B23-0330 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-27 - Law L23-0021, Effective from Sep 11, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 12636, Expires on Apr 23, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-27 - Law L23-0021, Effective from Sep 11, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 12636, Expires on Apr 23, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Children's Hospital Research and Innovation Campus Phase 1 Temporary Amendment Act of 2019
Title
Children's Hospital Research and Innovation Campus Phase 1 Temporary Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-09 - Council - Amendment (Todd) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-27 | Council | Law L23-0021, Effective from Sep 11, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 12636, Expires on Apr 23, 2020 |
2019-08-02 | Council | Act A23-0097 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 9726 |
2019-07-30 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2019-07-26 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2019-07-24 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0097 |
2019-07-15 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 29, 2019 |
2019-07-09 | Council | Final Reading |
2019-07-09 | Council | Amendment (Todd) |
2019-06-21 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0330 Published in the DC Register |
2019-06-18 | Council | First Reading |
2019-06-18 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-06-13 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |