DC B23-0333 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on June 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-07 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-07 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced it requires repair and mitigation when an abutting property owner has demonstrated damage by construction and the Department of Consumer and Regulatory Services has issued a stop work order.
Title
Illegal Construction Repair and Mitigation Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Phil Mendelson [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] |
Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-07 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-10-18 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-06-21 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0333 Published in the DC Register |
2019-06-18 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2019-06-11 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0333 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/42794/Introduction/B23-0333-Introduction.pdf |