DC B23-0337 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 19 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-12 - Act A23-0072 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 8065, Expires on Oct 02, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on June 19 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-12 - Act A23-0072 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 8065, Expires on Oct 02, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Short-Term Rental Independent Analysis Emergency Act of 2019
Title
Short-Term Rental Independent Analysis Emergency Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-12 | Council | Act A23-0072 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 8065, Expires on Oct 02, 2019 |
2019-07-04 | Council | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A23-0072, Expires on Oct 02, 2019 |
2019-07-03 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2019-06-25 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-06-19 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 3, 2019 |
2019-06-18 | Council | Final Reading |
2019-06-18 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |