DC B23-0338 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on June 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-30 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-30 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced it requires 30 days written notice to the Rent Administrator and tenant prior to evicting a tenant for nonpayment of rent. It requires the Court to seal certain eviction records and prohibits discrimination in housing based on a person having a sealed eviction record among other things.
Title
Eviction Record Sealing Authority Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] |
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-30 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-10-30 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-10-09 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-10-02 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-06-21 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0338 Published in the DC Register |
2019-06-18 | Council | Referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2019-06-18 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0338 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/42817/Introduction/B23-0338-Introduction.pdf |