DC B23-0341 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on June 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-18 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-18 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced it requires the Department of Health to distribute grant funds to promote a perinatal health worker training program for residents in Wards 5, 7, and 8 in the health field.
Title
Perinatal Health Worker Training Access Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-18 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-11-08 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-10-18 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-06-21 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0341 Published in the DC Register |
2019-06-18 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2019-06-18 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0341 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/42820/Introduction/B23-0341-Introduction.pdf |