DC B23-0346 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 19 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-28 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced it requires insurers to disclose the last known physical address of an owner or operator of a motor vehicle that was involved in an accident.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Last Known Address Disclosure Amendment Act Of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-28CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2019-10-11CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-06-28CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0346 Published in the DC Register
2019-06-25CouncilReferred to Committee on Business and Economic Development
2019-06-19CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback