DC B23-0354 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on July 1 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-26 - Act A23-0087 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 8489, Expires on Oct 14, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on July 1 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-26 - Act A23-0087 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 8489, Expires on Oct 14, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Florida Avenue Multimodal Project Completion Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2019
Title
Florida Avenue Multimodal Project Completion Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-25 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-26 | Council | Act A23-0087 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 8489, Expires on Oct 14, 2019 |
2019-07-17 | Council | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A23-0087, Expires on Oct 14, 2019 |
2019-07-16 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2019-07-09 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-07-01 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 16, 2019 |
2019-06-25 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-06-25 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |