DC B23-0357 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Act A23-0084 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 8274, Expires on Oct 14, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Act A23-0084 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 8274, Expires on Oct 14, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Close Relative Caregiver Subsidy Pilot Program Establishment Emergency Amendment Act of 2019
Title
Close Relative Caregiver Subsidy Pilot Program Establishment Emergency Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-25 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-19 | Council | Act A23-0084 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 8274, Expires on Oct 14, 2019 |
2019-07-16 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2019-07-16 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0084, Expires on Oct 14, 2019 |
2019-07-09 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-07-01 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 16, 2019 |
2019-06-25 | Council | Final Reading |
2019-06-25 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |