DC B23-0393 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on July 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-25 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-25 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced it requires a safe passage route for students traveling to and from LEA's via a designated route that is monitored by safe passage personnel from 7:00 am to 9:30 am and from 3:00 pm to 7:00 pm on Monday to Friday during the school year and summer. It also requires the Mayor to provide a shuttle bus from the metro station to a DCPS and public charter school within a priority area with the fewest public transportation options.
Title
Safe Passage to School Expansion Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] | Cnc. Trayon White [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] |
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] |
Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-10-25 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-07-19 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0393 Published in the DC Register |
2019-07-09 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2019-07-09 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0393 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/43043/Introduction/B23-0393-Introduction.pdf |