DC B23-0416 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-24 - Law L23-0118, Effective from Jun 24, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 8979
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-24 - Law L23-0118, Effective from Jun 24, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 8979
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law 23-188 adds provisions to the Comprehensive Newborn Screening Program to establish discharge standards and authorizes penalties for failure to comply with the standards or perform the necessary screens. It would also authorize the Department of Health to collect information from hospitals and birthing facilities to create a report card regarding compliance with newborn screening requirements, lactation support services, parent education, discharge standards, and clinical quality measures. It also creates a Perinatal and Infant Health Advisory Committee that would advise on ways to reduce preterm birth and newborn screening activities.
Title
Better Access for Babies to Integrated Equitable Services Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-07 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-24 | Council | Law L23-0118, Effective from Jun 24, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 8979 |
2020-05-15 | Council | Act A23-0310 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5090 |
2020-05-12 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2020-05-05 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-04-27 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0310 |
2020-04-17 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 1, 2020 |
2020-04-07 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-03-03 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-02-12 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-01-29 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0416 |
2019-12-18 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-11-08 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-10-18 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-09-20 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0416 Published in the DC Register |
2019-09-17 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2019-09-16 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |