DC B23-0436 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on September 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-11-19 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced Bill 23-436 requires special hiring agreements be completed prior to the beginning of a project. It must be accepted by the Department of Employment Services ("DOES") and posted on the Department's website. Reports providing information on every First Source project DOES is monitoring shall be submitted to the Council quarterly. It also requires an online list of current First Source projects.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

First Source Community Accountability Amendment Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-19CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2020-11-19CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2020-11-16CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-10-02CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-09-29CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-09-27CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0436 Published in the DC Register
2019-09-17CouncilReferred to Committee on Labor and Workforce Development
2019-09-17CouncilIntroduced in Committee of the Whole

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback