DC B23-0498 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on October 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-27 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-27 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 23-498 explicitly prohibits discrimination wholly or partially because of any combination of statutorily protected traits.
Title
Intersectional Discrimination Protection Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Trayon White [D] | Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] |
Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] |
Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-27 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-09-18 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-09-11 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-10-18 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0498 Published in the DC Register |
2019-10-08 | Council | Referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2019-10-08 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0498 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/43377/Introduction/B23-0498-Introduction.pdf |