DC B23-0522 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-25 - Act A23-0528 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14766
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-25 - Act A23-0528 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14766
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 23-522 orders the closing of a portion of Chesapeake Street, S.W., Magazine Road, S.W., and Keel Avenue, S.W., the Removal of building restriction lines associated with the portion of Chesapeake Street, S.W., being closed; and the transfer of jurisdiction back to the Secretary of the Navy of the portion of Keel Avenue, S.W. being closed, in Parcels 251/55, 251/56, 242,32 252/62, 259/11, 259/14 and 259/16 in Southwest Washington, D.C. in Ward 8.
Title
Closing a portion Chesapeake Street, S.W., Magazine Road, S.W., and Keel Avenue, S.W.; the removal of building restriction lines associated with the portion of Chesapeake Street, S.W., being closed; and the transfer of jurisdiction back to the Secretary of the Navy of the portion of Keel Avenue, S.W. being closed, in Parcels 251/55, 251/56, 242/32, 252/62, 259/1, 259/11, 259/14 and 259/16 in Southwest Washington, D.C., S.O. 14-21786, Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-11-10 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-10-20 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-10-20 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-25 | Council | Act A23-0528 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14766 |
2020-12-21 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-12-17 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0528 |
2020-12-08 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 22, 2020 |
2020-11-10 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-11-03 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-10-20 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-10-20 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0522 |
2020-09-17 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-09-17 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-07-31 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-07-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-11-08 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0522 Published in the DC Register |
2019-11-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2019-10-31 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |