DC B23-0526 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - Act A23-0173 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 15909, Expires on Feb 24, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - Act A23-0173 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 15909, Expires on Feb 24, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Federal Worker Housing Relief Extension Emergency Amendment Act of 2019
Title
Federal Worker Housing Relief Extension Emergency Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-11-05 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-06 | Council | Act A23-0173 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 15909, Expires on Feb 24, 2020 |
2019-11-26 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2019-11-26 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0173, Expires on Feb 24, 2020 |
2019-11-19 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-11-18 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 4, 2019 |
2019-11-05 | Council | Final Reading |
2019-11-05 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |