DC B23-0529 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on December 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-11 - Act A23-0504 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14396
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on December 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-11 - Act A23-0504 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14396
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, Bill 23-529 requires the Department of Health (DOH) to establish a certificate of stillbirth to be made available at the request of the parents named on a fetal death report registered with DOH. It also prohibits the certificate from being used to calculate live birth statistics or to be used to create liability. It also limits the access of information available on the certificate.
Title
Certificate of Stillbirth Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] |
Roll Calls
2020-11-10 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-11-10 - Council - Oral Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-11-10 - Council - Oral Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-11 | Council | Act A23-0504 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14396 |
2020-12-08 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-12-07 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0504 |
2020-11-23 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 8, 2020 |
2020-11-10 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-11-10 | Council | Oral Amendment (Mendelson) |
2020-10-20 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-10-07 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0529 |
2020-10-07 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-07-29 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-07-10 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-07-06 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-06-12 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-06-04 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-12-06 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-11-15 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0529 Published in the DC Register |
2019-11-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2019-11-05 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |